OK SB368 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB368
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Religious Freedom Act; prohibiting governmental declaration of religious institution as nonessential; prohibiting certain closures. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Religious Freedom Act; prohibiting governmental declaration of religious institution as nonessential; prohibiting certain closures. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. David Bullard [R] | Rep. Brian Hill [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] |
Rep. Mark Lawson [R] | Rep. Kevin West [R] | Rep. Dean Davis [R] | Rep. Logan Phillips [R] |
Rep. Jim Grego [R] | Rep. Denise Hader [R] | Rep. Brad Boles [R] | Sen. Rob Standridge [R] |
Sen. George Burns [R] | Sen. Shane Jett [R] | Sen. Blake Stephens [R] | Sen. Zack Taylor [R] |
Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: States Rights Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: States Rights Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/26/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Standridge |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | remove as coauthor Representative(s) Kendrix |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Grego |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 20 |
2021-04-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson, Boles, West (Kevin), CrosswhiteHader, Phillips, Kendrix, Russ |
2021-04-20 | House | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Gann |
2021-04-20 | House | General Order |
2021-03-31 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis |
2021-03-31 | House | CR; Do Pass States Rights Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to States Rights |
2021-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stephens |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Taylor |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Burns |
2021-03-02 | Senate | coauthored by Gann |
2021-03-02 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative Gann and substitute with Representative Hill |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Gann (principal House author) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bullard |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB368 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021