OK SB350 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - coauthored by Kirby (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - coauthored by Kirby (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Real property; making it unlawful to sell property without certain disclosure statement; construing law. Effective date.
Title
Real property; making it unlawful to sell property without certain disclosure statement; construing law. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | coauthored by Kirby (principal House author) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Business and Commerce |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Judiciary committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |