OK SB35 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB35
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; allowing valid military id for certain license requirements; modifying reciprocal inclusions. Effective date.
Title
Firearms; allowing valid military id for certain license requirements; modifying reciprocal inclusions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. George Faught [R] | Rep. Jeff Coody [R] |
Rep. Josh West [R] | Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/17/2017 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-11 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2017-04-20 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Faught |
2017-04-19 | House | General Order |
2017-04-11 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom |
2017-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-03-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-03-14 | Senate | coauthored by West (Josh) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dahm |
2017-03-06 | Senate | coauthored by Coody |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Brecheen |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McDugle (principal House author) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB35 (Carry Over) 2017-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1290 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |