OK SB346 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Property subject to forced sale; modifying procedure for appraisal of certain property. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property subject to forced sale; modifying procedure for appraisal of certain property. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateApproved by Governor 04/23/2019
2019-04-17SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-17HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-17SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-16SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-16HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-16HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 3
2019-04-16HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-02HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-03-05HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-05SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-04SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-04SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3
2019-03-04SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-19SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-02-12SenateCoauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author)
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Bice
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback