OK SB34 | 2023 | First Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Becomes law without Governor's signature 06/02/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sales tax exemption; requiring exemption be operative upon certain date; terminating certain calculation. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales tax exemption; requiring exemption be operative upon certain date; terminating certain calculation. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations And Budget: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-02SenateBecomes law without Governor's signature 06/02/2023
2023-05-26SenateSent to Governor
2023-05-26HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2023-05-26SenateEnrolled, to House
2023-05-26SenateReferred for enrollment
2023-05-26HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2023-05-26HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 4
2023-05-26HouseJCR adopted
2023-05-26HouseGeneral Order
2023-05-25HouseSecond Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
2023-05-24HouseFirst Reading
2023-05-24SenateEngrossed to House
2023-05-24SenateReferred for engrossment
2023-05-24SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
2023-05-24SenateJCR adopted
2023-05-23SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
2023-05-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2023-05-17SenateCoauthored by Representative Martinez
2023-05-17SenateCoauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
2023-05-17SenateCoauthored by Senator Hall
2023-05-17SenateAuthored by Senator Thompson (Roger)
2023-05-17SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb34&Session=231X
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/SB/SB34X%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/SB34X%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/SB/SB34X%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENR/SB/SB34X%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB34X%20PCS.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB34X%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB34X%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB34X_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB34X_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback