OK SB334 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB334
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Enacting clause restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Enacting clause restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Larceny; modifying certain time element. Effective date.
Title
Larceny; modifying certain time element. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Title restored |
2021-05-20 | Senate | CCR read |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) |
2021-05-06 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2021-05-06 | Senate | SCs named Paxton, Treat, Coleman, Jech, Garvin, Matthews, Floyd |
2021-04-28 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2021-04-26 | Senate | HAs read |
2021-04-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 19 |
2021-04-22 | House | General Order |
2021-04-01 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2021-04-01 | House | Title stricken |
2021-04-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 11 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Worthen (principal House author) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paxton |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB334 (Carry Over) 2021-05-20 - Enacting clause restored