OK SB327 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cemeteries; disposition of dead bodies at certain state facilities; repealing outdated statutes. Effective date.
Title
Cemeteries; disposition of dead bodies at certain state facilities; repealing outdated statutes. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/08/2015 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-04 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2015-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 2 |
2015-04-23 | House | General Order |
2015-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2015-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Cleveland (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |