OK SB312 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Elections; modifying dates upon which elections may be held by political subdivisions. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; modifying dates upon which elections may be held by political subdivisions. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 60 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateApproved by Governor 06/04/2015
2015-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2015-05-21HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2015-05-21SenateEnrolled, to House
2015-05-21SenateReferred for enrollment
2015-05-21HouseTo Senate
2015-05-21HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 20
2015-05-21HouseCCR adopted
2015-05-21HouseCCR submitted
2015-05-21SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2015-05-21SenateCCR adopted
2015-05-20SenateTitle restored
2015-05-20SenateCCR read
2015-05-12HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Elections and Ethics
2015-04-28SenateSCs named Holt, Justice, Dahm, Griffin, Treat, Floyd, Sparks
2015-04-20SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2015-04-16SenateHAs read
2015-04-16HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-04-15HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-04-15HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 25
2015-04-15HouseTitle stricken
2015-04-15HouseAmended
2015-04-15HouseGeneral Order
2015-03-25HouseCR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
2015-03-11HouseSecond Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
2015-03-10HouseFirst Reading
2015-03-10SenateEngrossed to House
2015-03-09SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-03-09SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2015-03-09SenateTitle restored
2015-03-09SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2015-03-02Senatecoauthored by Echols (principal House author)
2015-02-25SenateTitle stricken
2015-02-25SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
2015-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2015-02-02SenateAuthored by Senator Holt
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1116107New CodeSee Bill Text
1126112New CodeSee Bill Text
199015New CodeSee Bill Text
2613101New CodeSee Bill Text
2613102New CodeSee Bill Text
2613A103New CodeSee Bill Text
2613A109New CodeSee Bill Text
2613A110New CodeSee Bill Text
263101New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb312&Session=1500
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB312%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB312%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SB312%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SB/SB312%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SB312%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB312%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB312%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/SB/SB312%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB312_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB312_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback