OK SB305 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Medical marijuana; prohibiting employers from taking certain actions against a medical marijuana license holder except under certain conditions. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical marijuana; prohibiting employers from taking certain actions against a medical marijuana license holder except under certain conditions. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-18SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-14SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 12
2019-03-14SenateEmergency clause restored
2019-03-14SenateTitle restored
2019-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-03-13SenateGeneral Order, considered and deferred
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative McBride
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Tammy) (principal House author)
2019-02-21SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-02-21SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-21SenateReported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Daniels
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback