OK SB303 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB303

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-20 - Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Practice of medicine; modifying membership of the State Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision; removing certain limitation on appointees. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Practice of medicine; modifying membership of the State Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision; removing certain limitation on appointees. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-20SenateCoauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author)
2023-02-16SenateTitle stricken
2023-02-16SenateReported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2023-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2023-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Daniels
2023-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB303 (Carry Over) 2023-03-20 - Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author)

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback