OK SB301 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Juvenile affairs; creating the State Council for Juvenile Supervision; defining membership; stating powers and duties.
Title
Juvenile affairs; creating the State Council for Juvenile Supervision; defining membership; stating powers and duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 51) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 2 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 52) [FAIL]
2013-05-24 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 51) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 2 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 52) [FAIL]
2013-05-24 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/29/2013 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-24 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 2; Ayes: 64 Nays: 2 |
2013-05-24 | House | Ayes: 59 Nays: 2 |
2013-05-24 | House | CCR adopted |
2013-05-21 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-05-15 | Senate | CCR read |
2013-05-02 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-22 | Senate | SCs named Standridge, Crain, David, Griffin, Shumate, Johnson (Constance) |
2013-04-22 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-03-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-03-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 5 |
2013-03-26 | House | General Order |
2013-03-19 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-03-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Nelson (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |