OK SB30 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB30
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation; expanding powers and duties to include certain investigation. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation; expanding powers and duties to include certain investigation. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] | Rep. David Hardin [R] | Rep. Ben Loring [D] | Rep. Mark Lawson [R] |
Sen. Ron Sharp [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/14/2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Sharp |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-04-24 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson |
2019-04-23 | House | General Order |
2019-04-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Loring |
2019-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (David) (principal House author) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Shaw |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB30 (Carry Over) 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019