OK SB30 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation; expanding powers and duties to include certain investigation. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation; expanding powers and duties to include certain investigation. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateApproved by Governor 05/14/2019
2019-05-08SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-08HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-08SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-07SenateCoauthored by Senator Sharp
2019-05-07SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-07SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2019-05-07SenateHAs adopted
2019-04-24SenateHAs read
2019-04-24HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-23HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-23HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
2019-04-23HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Lawson
2019-04-23HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Loring
2019-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2019-03-05HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-05SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-04SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-04SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2019-03-04SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-27SenateCoauthored by Representative Hardin (David) (principal House author)
2019-02-25SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Shaw
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb30&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB30%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB30%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB30%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB30%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB30%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB30%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB30%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB30%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB30_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB30_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback