OK SB30 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB30
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State Department of Health; pregnancy assistance; directing Department to publish certain information online. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
State Department of Health; pregnancy assistance; directing Department to publish certain information online. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Rep. Tammy West [R] | Rep. John Enns [R] | Rep. Carl Newton [R] |
Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/26/2017 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Newton |
2017-04-19 | House | General Order |
2017-04-11 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Brecheen |
2017-04-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Enns |
2017-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2017-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Tammy) (principal House author) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB30 (Carry Over) 2017-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 737 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 752 | New Code | See Bill Text |