OK SB298 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB298

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Transfer-on-death deeds; clarifying ability of grantee beneficiary to accept certain property. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transfer-on-death deeds; clarifying ability of grantee beneficiary to accept certain property. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-26SenateApproved by Governor 04/26/2023
2023-04-20SenateSent to Governor
2023-04-20HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2023-04-20SenateEnrolled, to House
2023-04-19SenateReferred for enrollment
2023-04-19HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2023-04-19HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 16
2023-04-19HouseGeneral Order
2023-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee
2023-03-29HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
2023-03-06HouseFirst Reading
2023-03-06SenateEngrossed to House
2023-03-02SenateReferred for engrossment
2023-03-02SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2023-03-02SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2023-02-20SenateCoauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author)
2023-02-07SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2023-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2023-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Howard
2023-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB298 (Carry Over) 2023-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2023

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb298&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/SB/SB298%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/SB298%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/SB/SB298%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/SB298%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENR/SB/SB298%20ENR.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB298%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB298%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB298_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB298_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback