OK SB298 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB298
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealer; requirement of Tax Commission to provide informational publications to various motor vehicle commissions. Effective date.
Title
Repealer; requirement of Tax Commission to provide informational publications to various motor vehicle commissions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | Died in conference |
2017-05-25 | Senate | SCs named Thompson, Griffin, Bice, McCortney, Paxton, Floyd, Dossett |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference |
2017-05-17 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2017-05-12 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2017-05-11 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2017-05-01 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-05-01 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 1 |
2017-04-27 | House | Remove Representative Sears as principal House author and substitute with Representative Echols |
2017-04-27 | House | General Order |
2017-04-04 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation sub-committee |
2017-02-15 | Senate | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB298 (Carry Over) 2017-05-31 - Died in conference