OK SB288 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB288

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms; business owner's rights; clarifying civil liability provision. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; business owner's rights; clarifying civil liability provision. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenateApproved by Governor 05/31/2017
2017-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2017-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-05-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2017-05-20SenateReferred for enrollment
2017-05-20SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2017-05-20SenateHAs adopted
2017-05-20SenateCoauthored by Senator Pittman
2017-04-18SenateHAs read
2017-04-18HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-04-17HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-04-17HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 11
2017-04-17HouseGeneral Order
2017-04-04HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom
2017-04-04HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee
2017-03-28HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental
2017-03-23HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-23SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-22SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-22SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2017-03-22SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-03-14Senatecoauthored by West (Josh)
2017-03-13SenateCoauthored by Senator Dahm
2017-03-06Senatecoauthored by Roberts (Sean)
2017-03-01SenateCoauthored by Senator Brecheen
2017-02-27Senatecoauthored by Gann
2017-02-23SenateCoauthored by Representative Coody (principal House author)
2017-02-23SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Dossett
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB288 (Carry Over) 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21129022New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb288&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB288%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB288%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB288%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB288%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/SB/SB288%20ENR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB288%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB288%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB288%20SFLR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB288_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB288_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback