OK SB280 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Long-term care; modifying various provisions related to reimbursement of long-term care facilities. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Long-term care; modifying various provisions related to reimbursement of long-term care facilities. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28SenateApproved by Governor 05/28/2019
2019-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-22SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-22HouseTo Senate
2019-05-22HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
2019-05-22HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Roe
2019-05-22HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-22HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-22SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 1
2019-05-22SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-17SenateEmergency removed
2019-05-17SenateCCR read
2019-05-15SenateSCs named Simpson, Smalley, Rosino, Pugh, Ikley-Freeman, Young
2019-05-13HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Health Services and Long-Term Care
2019-05-09SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-04-29SenateCoauthored by Senator Scott
2019-04-22SenateCoauthored by Senator Kidd
2019-04-22SenateCoauthored by Representative Baker
2019-04-22SenateCoauthored by Representative McCall
2019-04-22SenateCoauthored by Representative Boles
2019-04-22SenateCoauthored by Representative Munson
2019-04-22SenateCoauthored by Representative Marti
2019-04-22SenateCoauthored by Representative Davis
2019-04-22SenateHAs read
2019-04-18HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-17HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-17HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
2019-04-17HouseEnacting clause restored
2019-04-17HouseEmergency added
2019-04-17HouseTitle restored
2019-04-17HouseAmended
2019-04-17HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-04-17HouseReturned to General Order
2019-04-17HouseThird Reading rescinded
2019-04-17HouseRecalled from engrossment
2019-04-17HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-17HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2019-04-17HouseAmended
2019-04-17HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-03HouseCR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care
2019-03-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-13SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2019-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-04SenateCoauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
2019-02-20SenateEnacting clause stricken
2019-02-20SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-20SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-18SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-18SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-02-18SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-18SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Simpson
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb280&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB280%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB280%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB280%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB280%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB280%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB280%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB280%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB280%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB280_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB280_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback