OK SB279 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB279
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-21 - Remove as author Senator Bergstrom; authored by Senator David
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-21 - Remove as author Senator Bergstrom; authored by Senator David
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grand River Dam Authority; increasing monetary amount of bonds authorized for issuance; providing for adjustment of amount. Effective date.
Title
Grand River Dam Authority; increasing monetary amount of bonds authorized for issuance; providing for adjustment of amount. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Josh West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Bergstrom; authored by Senator David |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Remove as author Senator David; authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB279 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author)