OK SB277 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Cities and towns; authorizing municipalities to collect certain information relating to public nuisances. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cities and towns; authorizing municipalities to collect certain information relating to public nuisances. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03SenateApproved by Governor 05/03/2021
2021-04-29SenateSent to Governor
2021-04-29HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2021-04-29SenateEnrolled, to House
2021-04-28SenateReferred for enrollment
2021-04-28SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 11
2021-04-28SenateHAs adopted
2021-04-14SenateHAs read
2021-04-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-04-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-04-13HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 1
2021-04-13HouseAmended
2021-04-13HouseHouse Rule suspended
2021-04-13HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Fugate, West (Kevin)
2021-04-13HouseGeneral Order
2021-03-29HouseCR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
2021-03-03HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-03SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-02SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-02SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
2021-03-02SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-03-02Senatecoauthored by Waldron
2021-02-22SenateCoauthored by Representative Pae (principal House author)
2021-02-11SenateReported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Montgomery
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb277&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB277%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB277%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB277%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/SB277%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB277%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/SB/SB277%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB277%20FA1%20PAEDA-AMM(UNTIMELY%20FILED).PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB277%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/senate/SB277%20INT%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB277%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB277%20HASB%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB277_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB277_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments 750

feedback