OK SB275 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB275

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms; prohibiting certain actions; inclusions; preemption provision. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; prohibiting certain actions; inclusions; preemption provision. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Judiciary
2018-02-05HouseWithdrawn from Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee
2017-03-28HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental
2017-03-23HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-23SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-22SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-22SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 3
2017-03-22SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2017-03-01SenateCoauthored by Senator Brecheen
2017-02-27Senatecoauthored by Gann
2017-02-23Senatecoauthored by Faught
2017-02-23Senatecoauthored by Bennett (John)
2017-02-23Senatecoauthored by Coody
2017-02-22SenateTitle stricken
2017-02-22SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2017-02-21SenateReferred to Appropriations
2017-02-21SenateCoauthored by Representative Jordan (principal House author)
2017-02-21SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Dahm
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB275 (Carry Over) 2017-03-28 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21128924New CodeSee Bill Text
51245Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback