OK SB274 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Self-insurance Guaranty Fund; modifying conditions to require certain assessment; increasing amount of certain assessment. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Self-insurance Guaranty Fund; modifying conditions to require certain assessment; increasing amount of certain assessment. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateApproved by Governor 04/25/2019
2019-04-22SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-17SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-17HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-17HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 1
2019-04-17HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-02HouseCR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Insurance
2019-03-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-13SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5
2019-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-06SenateCoauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
2019-02-26SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Paxton
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback