OK SB272 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred for engrossment
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Wireless telecommunications carriers; creating the Kelsey Smith Act; requiring carriers to provide call location information under certain emergency circumstances. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wireless telecommunications carriers; creating the Kelsey Smith Act; requiring carriers to provide call location information under certain emergency circumstances. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Technology Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-04-15HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 2
2021-04-15HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Fugate
2021-04-15HouseGeneral Order
2021-03-31HouseTitle restored
2021-03-31HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Technology Committee
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to Technology
2021-03-04HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-04SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-03SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-03SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2
2021-03-03SenateTitle stricken
2021-03-03SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2021-02-22SenateCoauthored by Senator Stephens
2021-02-22SenateCoauthored by Representative Worthen (principal House author)
2021-02-19SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Weaver
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb272&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB272%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB272%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB272%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB272%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB272%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/SB272%20HFLR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB272%20PCS.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB272%20FULLPCS1%20RANDE%20WORTHEN-GRS.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB272%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB272%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB272%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB272_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB272_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback