OK SB27 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB27
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pardon and parole; amending allowable notification procedures. Effective date.
Title
Pardon and parole; amending allowable notification procedures. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] | Rep. Carol Bush [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Shaw |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB27 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary