OK SB269 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB269
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; authorizing certain social media exchanges. Effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; authorizing certain social media exchanges. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/20/2022 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2022-04-28 | Senate | HAs read |
2022-04-28 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 25 |
2022-04-27 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2022-04-27 | House | House Rule suspended |
2022-04-27 | House | General Order |
2021-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2021-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Strom (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Coleman |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB269 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee