OK SB262 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB262
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Capitol buildings; directing that certain names be removed from the base of the Capitol Building dome.
Title
Capitol buildings; directing that certain names be removed from the base of the Capitol Building dome.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-16 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Emergency added |
2020-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB262 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)