OK SB261 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB261
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Election security; granting certain authority to State Election Board and county election boards relating to election security. Effective date.
Title
Election security; granting certain authority to State Election Board and county election boards relating to election security. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/25/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 2 |
2019-04-18 | House | General Order |
2019-03-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wright (principal House author) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boren |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB261 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019