OK SB259 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB259
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Driver licenses; directing photograph retrieval through Oklahoma Law Enforcement Telecommunications System. Effective dates.
Title
Driver licenses; directing photograph retrieval through Oklahoma Law Enforcement Telecommunications System. Effective dates.
Sponsors
Sen. Dewayne Pemberton [R] | Rep. Ross Ford [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Rep. Matt Meredith [D] |
Sen. Darrell Weaver [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/07/2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-02 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-04-22 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 3 |
2019-04-17 | House | Amended |
2019-04-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin) |
2019-04-17 | House | General Order |
2019-04-02 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Weaver |
2019-04-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Meredith |
2019-04-02 | House | Remove Representative Meredith as principal House author and substitute with Representative Ford |
2019-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 10 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Meredith (principal House author) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pemberton |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB259 (Carry Over) 2019-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2019