OK SB259 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-30 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-30 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; repealing various sections of the Motor Carrier Act. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; repealing various sections of the Motor Carrier Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-03-30 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2015-03-11 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-05 | Senate | coauthored by Bennett (principal House author) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Allen |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 162 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 166 | 5 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 169 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 169 | 3 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 169 | 4 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 169 | 5 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 169 | 6 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 169 | 7 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 170 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 170 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 171 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 171 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 172 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 177 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 177 | 3 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 24 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 26 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |