OK SB258 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB258

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Public buildings and public works; competitive bidding; establishing certain requirement if award not made to lowest bidder. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public buildings and public works; competitive bidding; establishing certain requirement if award not made to lowest bidder. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05HouseTitle restored
2017-04-05HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee
2017-03-28HouseReferred to Government Modernization
2017-03-28HouseWithdrawn from General Government Committee
2017-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to General Government Oversight and Accountability
2017-03-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-08SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-07SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-07SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 15
2017-03-07SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2017-03-06SenateCoauthored by Representative Murphey (principal House author)
2017-02-13SenateTitle stricken
2017-02-13SenateReported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Allen
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB258 (Carry Over) 2017-04-05 - Title restored

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback