OK SB252 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - CCR adoption rescinded
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Conditions of release of arrested persons; modifying requirements related to bail and personal recognizance. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conditions of release of arrested persons; modifying requirements related to bail and personal recognizance. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 30 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22HouseCCR adoption rescinded
2019-05-22HouseFourth Reading rescinded
2019-05-22HouseMotion to reconsider adopted
2019-05-22HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Kannady
2019-05-22HouseFourth Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 49
2019-05-22HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-17HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-17SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 30 Nays: 13
2019-05-17SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-17SenateCoauthored by Senator Sharp
2019-05-16SenateTitle restored
2019-05-16SenateCCR read
2019-05-15SenateCoauthored by Senator Kidd
2019-05-13HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary
2019-05-07SenateSCs named Thompson, Daniels, Jech, Bice, Coleman, Brooks, Floyd, Shaw, Matthews
2019-04-30SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-04-29SenateHAs read
2019-04-29HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 23
2019-04-25HouseAmended
2019-04-25HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Dunnington, Munson
2019-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-02HouseEnacting clause stricken
2019-04-02HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee
2019-03-25HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-03-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-18SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 8
2019-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-27SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-27SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-19SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-19SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateCoauthored by Representative Blancett
2019-02-04Senateremove as principal author Representative Blancett and substitute with Representative Kannady
2019-02-04SenateCoauthored by Representative Blancett (principal House author)
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Thompson
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb252&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB252%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB252%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB252%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB252%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB252%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB252%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB252%20CCS.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB252_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB252_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback