OK SB246 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle registration; modifying requirement and procedure related to security verification form. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicle registration; modifying requirement and procedure related to security verification form. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/21/2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 1 |
2015-04-15 | House | General Order |
2015-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2015-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Insurance committee; CR filed |
2015-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Mazzei |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |