OK SB243 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Surface damages; removing certain trial requirement. Effective date.
Title
Surface damages; removing certain trial requirement. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - House - House: Conference Committee on Natural Resources: CONFEREES ARE UNABLE TO AGREE (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 42 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 42 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Conferees unable to agree | |
2011-05-13 | SCs named Branan, Johnson (Rob), Marlatt, Holt, Paddack, Bass | |
2011-05-11 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Natural Resources | |
2011-05-10 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2011-04-26 | HAs read | |
2011-04-26 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-25 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 32; Ayes: 42 Nays: 34 | |
2011-04-25 | General Order | |
2011-04-12 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2011-04-12 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Energy and Utility Regulation Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Energy and Utility Regulation Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-03-16 | First Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-15 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-15 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-01 | coauthored by Trebilcock (principal House author) | |
2011-03-01 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Energy | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Branan | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |