OK SB24 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB24

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Driver licenses; motor vehicle report charges. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver licenses; motor vehicle report charges. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 13 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01SenateApproved by Governor 05/01/2017
2017-04-25SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-25HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-04-25SenateEnrolled, to House
2017-04-24SenateReferred for enrollment
2017-04-24HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-04-24HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 32
2017-04-24HouseGeneral Order
2017-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
2017-04-03HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
2017-03-27HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
2017-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2017-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-14SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6
2017-03-13SenateTitle restored
2017-03-13SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2017-03-13SenateBacked up to General Order
2017-03-13SenateMotion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2017-03-07SenateNotice served to reconsider vote on measure Allen
2017-03-07SenateMeasure failed: Ayes: 13 Nays: 29
2017-03-07SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-02-22SenateTitle stricken
2017-02-22SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2017-02-20SenateCoauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author)
2017-02-15SenateRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Allen
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB24 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2017

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
476117New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback