OK SB24 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-11 - coauthored by Ford
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-11 - coauthored by Ford
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Officers; allowing dual office holding. Effective date.
Title
Officers; allowing dual office holding. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-11 | coauthored by Ford | |
2009-03-11 | Remove as author Senator Ford; authored by Senator Anderson | |
2009-03-11 | Backed up to General Order | |
2009-03-11 | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-09 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Anderson | |
2009-03-09 | Measure failed: Ayes: 16 Nays: 30 | |
2009-03-09 | General Order, Amended | |
2009-02-10 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-09 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2009-02-02 | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Ford | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb24&Session=1000 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2009-10bills/SB/sb24_int.rtf |