OK SB238 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB238
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Wildlife services; adding feral swine to wildlife damage management; authorizing agents to carry firearms. Effective date.
Title
Wildlife services; adding feral swine to wildlife damage management; authorizing agents to carry firearms. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Enns [R] | Sen. Larry Boggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2017-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Enns (principal House author) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boggs |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB238 (Carry Over) 2017-03-28 - CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee