OK SB238 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Capitol Improvement Authority; authorizing bond issuance; authorizing property acquisition. Emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Capitol Improvement Authority; authorizing bond issuance; authorizing property acquisition. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale DeWitt [R] | Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] |
Sen. Mike Johnson [R] | Rep. Scott Martin [R] | Rep. Ken Miller [R] | Sen. David Myers [R] |
Rep. Daniel Sullivan [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2009-04-09 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2009-04-09 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-27 | Approved by Governor 04/27/2009 | |
2009-04-21 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-21 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-04-21 | Enrolled, to House | |
2009-04-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-04-20 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2 | |
2009-04-20 | coauthored by Fields, DeWitt | |
2009-04-20 | HAs adopted | |
2009-04-13 | HAs read | |
2009-04-13 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-09 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 12 | |
2009-04-09 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sullivan | |
2009-04-09 | General Order | |
2009-04-06 | Title restored | |
2009-04-06 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dorman | |
2009-04-06 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-03-04 | First Reading | |
2009-03-04 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-03 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-03 | coauthored by Martin (Scott) | |
2009-03-03 | coauthored by Miller (principal House author) | |
2009-03-03 | Title stricken | |
2009-03-03 | General Order, Amended | |
2009-02-16 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Martin (Scott) | |
2009-02-16 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Miller | |
2009-02-09 | Direct to Calendar | |
2009-02-02 | coauthored by Myers | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Mike) | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
73 | 163 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
73 | 333 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
73 | 335 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |