OK SB236 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health insurance navigators; requiring certain inspection; prohibiting certain information. Effective date.
Title
Health insurance navigators; requiring certain inspection; prohibiting certain information. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/21/2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1 |
2015-04-14 | House | General Order |
2015-04-08 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman |
2015-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2015-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 2 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | coauthored by Cox (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Yen |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 1415 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 1415 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |