OK SB23 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB23

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Taxicabs; definition; modifying number of passengers. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxicabs; definition; modifying number of passengers. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24SenateApproved by Governor 04/24/2017
2017-04-18SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-18HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-04-18SenateEnrolled, to House
2017-04-17SenateReferred for enrollment
2017-04-17HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-04-17HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 3
2017-04-17HouseGeneral Order
2017-04-10HouseCR; Do Pass Transportation Committee
2017-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2017-03-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-09SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-08SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-08SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 8
2017-03-08SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2017-02-16SenateCoauthored by Representative Vaughan (principal House author)
2017-02-14SenateReported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Allen
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB23 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
471174New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback