OK SB23 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB23
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Taxicabs; definition; modifying number of passengers. Effective date.
Title
Taxicabs; definition; modifying number of passengers. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 3 |
2017-04-17 | House | General Order |
2017-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2017-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 8 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Vaughan (principal House author) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Allen |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB23 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017