OK SB228 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Pesticide applicators, process for filing suit for certain damages.
Title
Pesticide applicators, process for filing suit for certain damages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2004-01-01 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2004-01-01 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/20/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-16 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-16 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-13 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-13 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-13 | coauthored by Ivester | |
2011-05-13 | HAs adopted | |
2011-04-12 | HAs read | |
2011-04-12 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-11 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0; Ayes: 61 Nays: 36 | |
2011-04-11 | General Order | |
2011-03-30 | Title restored | |
2011-03-30 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment | |
2011-03-10 | First Reading | |
2011-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-09 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-09 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-09 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-03-01 | coauthored by Jackson (principal House author) | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2011-02-28 | Withdrawn from Rules committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Justice | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |