OK SB226 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB226
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - coauthored by ODonnell
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - coauthored by ODonnell
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; providing certain immunity; providing exceptions; prohibiting certain action against officers. Effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; providing certain immunity; providing exceptions; prohibiting certain action against officers. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Rep. Scott Biggs [R] | Rep. Mike Sanders [R] | Rep. Charles McCall [R] |
Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R] | Rep. Meloyde Blancett [D] | Rep. Avery Frix [R] | Rep. Tammy West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | coauthored by ODonnell |
2018-02-28 | Senate | coauthored by Frix |
2018-02-27 | Senate | coauthored by Blancett |
2018-02-26 | Senate | coauthored by West (Tammy) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | coauthored by Sanders |
2018-02-26 | Senate | coauthored by McCall |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Biggs (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB226 (Carry Over) 2017-03-01 - Coauthored by Representative Biggs (principal House author)
Code Citations
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb226&Session=1800 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB226%20INT.PDF |