OK SB223 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Counties and county government; free fair associations. Effective date.
Title
Counties and county government; free fair associations. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Approved by Governor 04/19/2012 | |
2012-04-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-16 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-16 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-04-12 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-12 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-12 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-12 | General Order | |
2012-04-04 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2012-03-15 | First Reading | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-27 | coauthored by Sanders (principal House author) | |
2012-02-27 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Ballenger | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |