OK SB22 | 2017 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-26 - Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
Pending: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Public finance; specifying certain duty of Director of OMES. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public finance; specifying certain duty of Director of OMES. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2017-09-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Fields
2017-09-25SenateAuthored by Senator David
2017-09-25SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
623467New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback