OK SB2199 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; requiring school districts to conduct criminal record search on prospective employees. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; requiring school districts to conduct criminal record search on prospective employees. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Coffee [R] | Rep. Rex Duncan [R] | Sen. Mary Easley [D] | Rep. Tad Jones [R] |
Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Jeannie McDaniel [D] | Rep. Jason Murphey [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-26 - House - House: (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/08/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-27 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-26 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-26 | To Senate | |
2010-05-26 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-26 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-21 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-21 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-21 | coauthored by Sherrer | |
2010-05-21 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-18 | CCR read | |
2010-05-03 | Conference granted, HC's named Jones, Coody, Sears, Thomsen, Cannaday, Auffet | |
2010-04-29 | SCs named Coffee, Ford, Jolley, Lamb, Easley | |
2010-04-28 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-26 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Sherrer | |
2010-04-21 | HAs read | |
2010-04-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-20 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1; Ayes: 22 Nays: 18 | |
2010-04-20 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Duncan, Murphey | |
2010-04-20 | General Order | |
2010-03-25 | Title restored | |
2010-03-25 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern, McDaniel (Jeannie) | |
2010-03-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-08 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 | |
2010-03-08 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2010-02-17 | coauthored by Jones (principal House author) | |
2010-02-17 | coauthored by Easley | |
2010-02-17 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-17 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-16 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Jones | |
2010-02-15 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Easley | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Coffee | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |