OK SB218 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-17 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-17 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; specifying certain vehicles shall not be required to have uninsured motorist coverage. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; specifying certain vehicles shall not be required to have uninsured motorist coverage. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Insurance: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House: R (Y: 34 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2011-04-14 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House: R (Y: 34 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2011-04-14 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-17 | CCR read | |
2011-05-10 | SCs named Marlatt, Brown, Johnson (Rob), Nichols, Sparks, Burrage | |
2011-05-09 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Insurance and Economic Development | |
2011-05-05 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2011-04-25 | HAs read | |
2011-04-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-20 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 34 | |
2011-04-20 | General Order | |
2011-04-18 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2011-04-18 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Insurance Committee | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-16 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-16 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Sullivan (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Marlatt | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |