OK SB2128 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; relating to the Oklahoma Affordable Housing Tax Incentive Act of 2014. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; relating to the Oklahoma Affordable Housing Tax Incentive Act of 2014. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-16 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-03SenateApproved by Governor 06/03/2014
2014-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2014-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2014-05-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2014-05-22SenateReferred for enrollment
2014-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2014-05-22HouseMotion to reconsider tabled
2014-05-22HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 27
2014-05-22HouseJCR adopted
2014-05-22HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Sparks
2014-05-22HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Schwartz, Jackson, Pittman
2014-05-22HouseRemove as coauthor Representative(s) Inman
2014-05-22HouseGeneral Order
2014-05-21HouseWithdrawn from Calendar, referred to Joint Calendar
2014-05-21HouseSecond Reading, direct to Calendar
2014-05-20HouseFirst Reading
2014-05-20SenateEngrossed to House
2014-05-20SenateReferred for engrossment
2014-05-20SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 15
2014-05-20SenateJCR adopted
2014-05-20Senatecoauthored by Sanders
2014-05-19Senatecoauthored by Inman
2014-05-19Senatecoauthored by Marlatt, Schulz
2014-05-16SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
2014-05-15Senatecoauthored by McNiel, Denney
2014-05-13Senatecoauthored by Griffin
2014-04-28SenateSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2014-03-27Senatecoauthored by Sears
2014-03-27Senatecoauthored by Martin (Scott) (principal House author)
2014-03-27Senatecoauthored by Justice
2014-03-27SenateAuthored by Senator Jolley
2014-03-27SenateFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
682357403Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback