OK SB2098 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; towing vehicles and wrecker liability; making certain persons exempt from liability; release of certain personal property; removal of interlock devices. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; towing vehicles and wrecker liability; making certain persons exempt from liability; release of certain personal property; removal of interlock devices. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/12/2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 1 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2014-04-23 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3 |
2014-04-22 | House | General Order |
2014-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2014-02-06 | Senate | coauthored by Martin (Steve) (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Barrington |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |