OK SB2078 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Authorized disclosure of confidential information; modifying entities to whom certain information may be disclosed. Effective date.
Title
Authorized disclosure of confidential information; modifying entities to whom certain information may be disclosed. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/12/2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2014-04-21 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-16 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 19 |
2014-04-16 | House | General Order |
2014-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2014-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by Grau (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Barrington |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |