OK SB2041 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; relating to refusing to receive prisoners; requiring certain persons to pay costs for prisoner medical care. Effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; relating to refusing to receive prisoners; requiring certain persons to pay costs for prisoner medical care. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - House - House: A (Y: 53 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2010-03-24 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2010-03-24 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-26 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 4 | |
2010-05-26 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-26 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-26 | Title restored | |
2010-05-26 | CCR read | |
2010-05-05 | Conference granted, HC's named Johnson, Buck, Walker, Martin (Steve), Tibbs, Holland | |
2010-04-29 | SCs named Sykes, Anderson, Crain, Jolley, Laster | |
2010-04-28 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-26 | HAs read | |
2010-04-22 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-21 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 33 | |
2010-04-21 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-04-21 | Title stricken | |
2010-04-21 | Amended | |
2010-04-21 | Ayes: 53 Nays: 29 | |
2010-04-21 | Motion to reconsider vote whereby amendment failed | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on General Order | |
2010-04-21 | Motion to rescind advancement from General Order adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Motion to rescind Third Reading adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Third Reading | |
2010-04-21 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 60 Nays: 28 | |
2010-04-20 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Johnson | |
2010-04-20 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 56 | |
2010-04-20 | General Order | |
2010-03-25 | Title restored | |
2010-03-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2010-03-04 | First Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-03 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-03 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2010-03-03 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-02-10 | coauthored by Johnson (principal House author) | |
2010-02-10 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-09 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Johnson | |
2010-02-09 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Sykes | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |